TN HB0071 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises of Zoo Knoxville and Nashville Zoo during the zoos' regular operating hours. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises of Zoo Knoxville and Nashville Zoo during the zoos' regular operating hours. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 300
2019-04-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/6/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0181 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 300

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback