TN SB0181 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises of Zoo Knoxville and Nashville Zoo during the zoos' regular operating hours. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises of Zoo Knoxville and Nashville Zoo during the zoos' regular operating hours. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Pub. Ch. 300
2019-05-13 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
2019-05-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 55, Nays 39, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 0, PNV 2
2019-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0055)
2019-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0071 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 300

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback