TN HB0051 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, decreases the frequency that banks that collect property taxes must provide evidence of such payments to the trustee, from daily to at least every three business days; deletes an obsolete code section; deletes outdated references to penalties that are no longer applied. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, decreases the frequency that banks that collect property taxes must provide evidence of such payments to the trustee, from daily to at least every three business days; deletes an obsolete code section; deletes outdated references to penalties that are no longer applied. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 220 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-02-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/13/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/6/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0393 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 220