TN HB0044 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, funds social worker positions through the BEP at a ratio of one per 1,500 or fewer students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 3, relative to school social workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1257 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.