TN HB0042 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires applicants for a technician certificate of registration, master barber certificate of registration, barber instructor certificate of registration, cosmetologist license, manicuring license, cosmetology instructor license, aesthetician license, or natural hair styling license to obtain up to one hour of online or in-person training by a nonprofit on domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-14 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0042&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HB0042.pdf |