TN HB0042 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the punishment for a person committing the offense of illegal possession of a handgun. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, reduces the punishment for a person committing the offense of illegal possession of a handgun. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 1/30/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |