TN HB0042 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the punishment for a person committing the offense of illegal possession of a handgun. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the punishment for a person committing the offense of illegal possession of a handgun. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseWithdrawn.
2019-01-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-01-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 1/30/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-01-19HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback