TN HB0039 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires search warrant or written consent prior to a blood test being performed to determine alcoholic or drug content of a driver's blood; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, requires search warrant or written consent prior to a blood test being performed to determine alcoholic or drug content of a driver's blood; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 304 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-26 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0039 |
2017-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0428) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0427) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0150) |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0134 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304