TN HB0032 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to post on the department's website the continuing education requirements, including a minimum number of required hours as well as appropriate curriculum, for persons licensed as crop insurance adjusters. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to post on the department's website the continuing education requirements, including a minimum number of required hours as well as appropriate curriculum, for persons licensed as crop insurance adjusters. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee |
2019-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |