TN HB0030 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens barbers' ability to perform services in a residence from residences of persons who are actually ill to all residences regardless of the health of the person; requires residential barber certificate in order to provide residential services. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
As enacted, broadens barbers' ability to perform services in a residence from residences of persons who are actually ill to all residences regardless of the health of the person; requires residential barber certificate in order to provide residential services. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 102 | |
2017-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0032 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 102