TN SB0032 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens barbers' ability to perform services in a residence from residences of persons who are actually ill to all residences regardless of the health of the person; requires residential barber certificate in order to provide residential services. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
As enacted, broadens barbers' ability to perform services in a residence from residences of persons who are actually ill to all residences regardless of the health of the person; requires residential barber certificate in order to provide residential services. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 102 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2017; 01/01/2018 | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 4, PNV 2 |
2017-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0066) |
2017-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0065) |
2017-03-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0013) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0006) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/13/2017 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/7/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 2/7/2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/31/2017 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0030 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 102