TN HB0025 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a four-year period, by reducing the amount of the tax by $100 each year, for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a four-year period, by reducing the amount of the tax by $100 each year, for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0015 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017