TN HB0024 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Failed for lack of motion in: Business & Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Failed for lack of motion in: Business & Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires public utilities and railroads to adhere to certain compensation, notification, and other requirements concerning public utility facilities located within, or to be located within, a railroad right-of-way. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 29; Title 65 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 29; Title 65 and Title 66, relative to railroad rights-of-way.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2020-12-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1256 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee