TN HB0021 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the nomination process for candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, changes the nomination process for candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0027 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 2020