TN SB0027 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 9:30 am in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the nomination process for candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes the nomination process for candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-01-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on Clerk''s Desk pending committe appointments.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0021 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback