TN HB0017 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the required element for self-defense that the person "not be engaged in unlawful activity" with the required element that the person "not be engaged in conduct that would constitute a felony or Class A misdemeanor"; declares, for purposes of determining if a person has a duty to retreat before threatening or using force in self-defense, that a person is not considered to be engaged in conduct that would constitute a felony or Class A misdemeanor or in a place where the person does not have a right to be if the person is engaged in the activity or in a place due to the person's status as a victim of human trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6, relative to justifications excluding criminal responsibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0188 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021