TN SB0188 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the required element for self-defense that the person "not be engaged in unlawful activity" with the required element that the person "not be engaged in conduct that would constitute a felony or Class A misdemeanor"; declares, for purposes of determining if a person has a duty to retreat before threatening or using force in self-defense, that a person is not considered to be engaged in conduct that would constitute a felony or Class A misdemeanor or in a place where the person does not have a right to be if the person is engaged in the activity or in a place due to the person's status as a victim of human trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6, relative to justifications excluding criminal responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 115 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0040) |
2021-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0017 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115