TN HB0016 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for additional notice to legislative committees, lengthens certain reporting deadlines and authorizes additional assistance to the commissioner of intellectual and developmental disabilities concerning determining the fiscal impact of certain changes impacting certain licensees of the department of mental health. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, provides for additional notice to legislative committees, lengthens certain reporting deadlines and authorizes additional assistance to the commissioner of intellectual and developmental disabilities concerning determining the fiscal impact of certain changes impacting certain licensees of the department of mental health. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of HHR | |
2011-01-13 | Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2011-01-13 | P2C held on desk pending the appointment of standing committees. | |
2011-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1196 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Gen. Welf. Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0016&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0016.pdf |