TN HB0010 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes provisions in current law that override the ability of various persons to object to vaccinations, immunizations, or other medical procedures on the basis of religious tenets and practices. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFailed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/2/2021
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2021
2021-02-16HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Health Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-11-17HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0007 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback