TN SB0007 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes provisions in current law that override the ability of various persons to object to vaccinations, immunizations, or other medical procedures on the basis of religious tenets and practices. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-11-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0010 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-02 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback