TN HB0002 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that an ultrasound be performed prior to an abortion, with an exception for medical emergencies. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 9 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
As introduced, requires that an ultrasound be performed prior to an abortion, with an exception for medical emergencies. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 9 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/26/2016 |
2015-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2016 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-11-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0775 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0002&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0002.pdf |