SD SCR602 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 517
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 517
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage the executive branch of this state to examine mitigation efforts to curtail the spread of aquatic invasive species.
Title
To encourage the executive branch of this state to examine mitigation efforts to curtail the spread of aquatic invasive species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 517 |
2022-03-01 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 464 |
2022-02-23 | House | First Reading House H.J. 428 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 303 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 303 Amendment SCR602F |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 293 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 274 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 150 |