SD SCR12 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 566
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the continuation of the Perkins Loan Program and urging Congress to take immediate action to permanently reauthorize the program, in its entirety and in its original form.
Title
Expressing support for the continuation of the Perkins Loan Program and urging Congress to take immediate action to permanently reauthorize the program, in its entirety and in its original form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 566 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 545 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 517 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 498 |