SD SB54 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain procedures for the commencement of civil actions by inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain procedures for the commencement of civil actions by inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-12 Signed by Governor S.J. 673
2010-03-10 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 632
2010-03-10 Signed by Speaker H.J. 801
2010-03-08 Signed by President S.J. 603
2010-03-04 Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 567
2010-03-02 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 2. H.J. 660
2010-03-02 House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 660 Amendment 54rb
2010-03-01 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643
2010-02-24 Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 599
2010-02-24 Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54ra
2010-02-24 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-22 Deferred by Chair
2010-02-22 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-10 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 350
2010-02-09 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 263
2010-02-04 Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 250
2010-02-02 Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 205
2010-02-02 Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54ja
2010-02-02 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-19 Deferred by Chair
2010-01-19 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-12 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback