SD SB46 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow for the consideration of certain instruction to count towards the minimum number of hours required in a school term during a declared state of emergency.
Title
Allow for the consideration of certain instruction to count towards the minimum number of hours required in a school term during a declared state of emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140 |
2021-01-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 159 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 137 |
2021-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 134 |
2021-01-25 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 60 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 83 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 14 |