SD SB43 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish procedures for the imposition of fines and probation against medical cannabis establishments, increase the allowable fee for a medical cannabis establishment registration certificate, and direct the Department of Health to promulgate rules to increase the fee for a registration certificate.
Title
Establish procedures for the imposition of fines and probation against medical cannabis establishments, increase the allowable fee for a medical cannabis establishment registration certificate, and direct the Department of Health to promulgate rules to increase the fee for a registration certificate.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2024 S.J. 480 |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 468 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 461 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 441 |
2024-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 403 |
2024-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 403 Amendment 43C |
2024-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 374 |
2024-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 369 |
2024-02-15 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-15 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 43B |
2024-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 155 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 11. S.J. 131 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 130 Amendment 43A |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 94 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 84 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 19 |
Subjects
Executive/Judiciary Request
Fees
Health Care
Medical Cannabis
Promulgation of Rules
Public Health and Safety
Rule Change
Fees
Health Care
Medical Cannabis
Promulgation of Rules
Public Health and Safety
Rule Change