SD SB43 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Signed by the Governor on February 03, 2023 S.J. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Signed by the Governor on February 03, 2023 S.J. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding money transmission.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding money transmission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 03, 2023 S.J. 186 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2023 S.J. 145 |
2023-01-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 174 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 128 |
2023-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 98 |
2023-01-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2023-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 61 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 60 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 13 |