SD SB194 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - Tabled (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-11 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-10 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-03-09 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 183 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/22215 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216606.pdf |
Roll Call | https://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71106 |