SD SB181 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for road improvements leading to the State Veterans Cemetery and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for road improvements leading to the State Veterans Cemetery and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 465
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 514
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 396
2021-03-01JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4.
2021-03-01JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 181B
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-24JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 3
2021-02-11SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 3 Amendment 181A
2021-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 171

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback