SD SB181 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide licensing reciprocity for social workers.
Title
Provide licensing reciprocity for social workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 738 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 533 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 476 |
2013-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-19 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 272 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 280 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 280 Amendment 181oa |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 234 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 181jc |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 181ja |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 178 |