SD SB18 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the South Dakota Department of Corrections to demolish buildings at STAR Academy, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the South Dakota Department of Corrections to demolish buildings at STAR Academy, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateState Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback