SD SB18 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - First Reading House H.J. 277
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding professional counselors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding professional counselors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 277
2020-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 208
2020-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 188
2020-02-07SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2020-02-07SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 18B
2020-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-14SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 10

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback