SD SB18 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Signed by Governor S.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Signed by Governor S.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain requirements regarding a commercial driver license.
Title
Revise certain requirements regarding a commercial driver license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Signed by Governor S.J. 442 | |
2011-02-14 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 411 | |
2011-02-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-09 | Signed by President S.J. 390 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 328 | |
2011-02-03 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-03 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 275 | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 227 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 228 | |
2011-01-26 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 209 | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 18 |