SD SB176 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Uniform Faithful Presidential Electors Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Uniform Faithful Presidential Electors Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Deferred to another day (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 1
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-03-01HouseJudiciary Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 5. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 400
2021-02-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 357
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 306
2021-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 297
2021-02-16SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 3
2021-02-16SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 176A
2021-02-16SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 170

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback