SD SB175 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - No motion to place on calendar S.J. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - No motion to place on calendar S.J. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the participation of independent voters in primary elections.
Title
Provide for the participation of independent voters in primary elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Sen. Ried Holien [R] | Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] |
Rep. Mark Venner [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Local Government Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | No motion to place on calendar S.J. 467 | |
2011-02-16 | Local Government Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 444 | |
2011-02-16 | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-14 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 243 |