SD SB163 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 372
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 372
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Address transparency in prescription drug pricing.
Title
Address transparency in prescription drug pricing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Reconsidered (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 372 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 341 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 17. S.J. 341 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 340 Amendment 163D |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 304 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 163C |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 129 |