SD SB163 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the eligibility requirements for compassionate parole under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the eligibility requirements for compassionate parole under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
2021-02-18SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 163A
2021-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-16SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 142

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback