SD SB144 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to provide for a crisis stabilization unit and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to provide for a crisis stabilization unit and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 465
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 518
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 400
2021-03-02JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3.
2021-03-02JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-18JointScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 133

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback