SD SB14 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand authorization for the conditional taking of coyotes from snowmobiles.
Title
Expand authorization for the conditional taking of coyotes from snowmobiles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 13, 2024 S.J. 309 |
2024-02-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 312 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 289 |
2024-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 280 |
2024-02-06 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-06 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 165 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 150 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 130 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 14A |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 16 |