SD SB137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the payment of claims for covered services provided by a health care professional via telehealth.
Title
Provide for the payment of claims for covered services provided by a health care professional via telehealth.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] |
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] |
Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] |
Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] | Sen. John Lake [R] | Rep. Steven McCleerey [D] |
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Nancy York [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Referred to House Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Referred to House Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733 |
2019-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 747 |
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 685 |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 1. S.J. 680 |
2019-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 680 |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 627 |
2019-03-05 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 137bb |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services, Passed H.J. 517 |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 516 |
2019-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 329 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 286 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 266 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 221 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 137ka |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 189 |