SD SB133 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate coronavirus funds and to declare an emergency.
Title
Appropriate coronavirus funds and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Tabled (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 525 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 438 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 357 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 339 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 2 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 133 |