SD SB126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding municipal annual reports.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding municipal annual reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738 |
2018-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660 |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 653 |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 605 |
2018-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 0. H.J. 578 |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 545 |
2018-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 315 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 333 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 284 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 224 |