SD SB125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to violations associated with the statewide one-call notification system.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to violations associated with the statewide one-call notification system.
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Sen. Jason Gant [R] | Sen. Margaret Gillespie [D] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] |
Sen. Ben Nesselhuf [D] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 768 | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-08 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 716 | |
2010-03-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 384 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 306 | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 254 | |
2010-02-09 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 125ta | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 164 |