SD SB118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the register of deeds to electronically preserve certain documents.
Title
Allow the register of deeds to electronically preserve certain documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Signed by Governor S.J. 626 | |
2010-03-04 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 566 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 532 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 636 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 383 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 305 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-10 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 274 | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 150 |