SD SB116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize legislative intervention into certain cases pertaining to election law.
Title
Authorize legislative intervention into certain cases pertaining to election law.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] | Sen. Sydney Davis [R] |
Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Rep. Tim Reisch [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 4 |
2023-02-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 7. H.J. 4 |
2023-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 248 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 203 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 202 Amendment 116C |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 190 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 116B |
2023-02-01 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 116A |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 114 |