SD SB116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 34. H.J. 690
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Create the Dakota promise fund, provide Dakota promise grants, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the Dakota promise fund, provide Dakota promise grants, and to make an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 32 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 34. H.J. 690
2019-03-07HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 690
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 37, NAYS 28. H.J. 690
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 664
2019-03-04HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 597
2019-03-04HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 116zg
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 552
2019-02-25SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 504 Amendment 116ztc
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 504
2019-02-25SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 503 Amendment 116ze
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 440 Amendment 116ztb
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 116zd
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 116za
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 185

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=116&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB116P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB116SAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB116S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB116HED.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28552&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28795&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29062&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29334&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29336&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback