SD SB114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a refund for the contractor's excise tax for certain residential housing projects.
Title
Provide a refund for the contractor's excise tax for certain residential housing projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 116 |