SD SB104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and revise certain provisions relating to the requirements for a permit to carry a concealed pistol.
Title
Repeal and revise certain provisions relating to the requirements for a permit to carry a concealed pistol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Tabled (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 547 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary, Passed S.J. 525 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 525 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed S.J. 306 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 264 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 175 |