SD HJR5005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 18. H.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 18. H.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the voters at the 2022 general election a new section to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the creation and administration of the South Dakota forever trust fund.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the voters at the 2022 general election a new section to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the creation and administration of the South Dakota forever trust fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Karr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Tabled (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 18. H.J. 430 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 381 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |