SD HJR1005 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating Oglala Lakota County as the new name of Shannon County.
Title
Designating Oglala Lakota County as the new name of Shannon County.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Killer [D] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] |
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 713 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 643 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 609 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 581 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 448 |
2015-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 438 |
2015-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416 |
2015-02-11 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 397 |
2015-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 286 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 267 |